Nimni, Gil Baroh (CPSO#: 72894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GSH Medical
#100-801 Eglinton Ave West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 789-2449
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Headache, Migraine & Concussion Cen
555 Kingston Rd. West
1st Floor
Ajax ON  L1S 6M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 477-4677
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gil B. Nimni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nimni ( CPSO# 72894 )

Business Address:
Headache Migraine & Concussion Centre Inc.
555 Kingston Road West
1st Floor
Ajax ON  L1S 6M1
Phone Number: (905) 477-4677

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
GSH Medical
100 - 801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIL BAROH NIMNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 09 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999