Ninan, Ajit Thyparampil (CPSO#: 85397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Children and
Youth Services CPRI
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2312
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ninan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ninan ( CPSO# 85397 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJIT THYPARAMPIL NINAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NINAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007