Ninan, Vadakethu Thomas (CPSO#: 83191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospital Drive Site
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. T. Ninan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ninan ( CPSO# 83191 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospital Drive Site
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7L6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VADAKETHU THOMAS NINAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NINAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2008