Ning, Shuoyan (CPSO#: 95426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Fontbonne Level 3, F306
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36178
Fax: 905-540-6568
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ning ( CPSO# 95426 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Fontbonne Level 3
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6024

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUOYAN NING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015