Niraula, Saroj (CPSO#: 90311)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Mandarin, Nepali

Education:Zhengzhou University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 15 Jun 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2012