Nita, Dragos Alexandru (CPSO#: 89300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary - Galaxy 12
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4C8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Boomerang Health
9401 Jane St Suite 211
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 553-3155
Fax: (905) 553-8120
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Neurology Centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Ave W, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 860-7554
Fax: (416) 860-7559
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

NeuroCare Neurology Neurophysiology
1110 Sheppard Ave E, Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avramescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Avramescu ( CPSO# 88763 )
Dr. D. Nita ( CPSO# 89300 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 224-1922

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
Galaxy 12
Toronto ON  M1E 4C8
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
Boomergan Health
9401 Jane Street
Suite 211
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 553-3155

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGOS ALEXANDRU NITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014