Niu, Jim Chun-Ping (CPSO#: 109954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Élisabeth Bruyère Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
75 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIM CHUN-PING NIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018