Nnorom, Onyenyechukwu (CPSO#: 86730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TAIBU Community Health Centre
Unit 1
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Phone: (416) 644-3536
Fax: (416) 644-0102
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 901
505 Consumers Road
Willowdale ON  M2J 4V8
Canada
Phone: 416 631 3000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 77400
Fax: 416-599-8265
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Nnorom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Nnorom ( CPSO# 86730 )

Business Address:
1 - 27 Tapscott Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 644-3536

Business Address:
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
901 - 505 Consumers Road
Willowdale ON  M2J 4V8
Phone Number: (416) 631-3000

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 23 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ONYENYECHUKWU NNOROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NNOROM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2010 to 23 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009