Noble Wohlgemut, Matthew Angus (CPSO#: 80641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: Wohlgemut, Matthew Angus (used until: 07 Aug 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
230 Canboro Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: (905) 957-2475
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Noble Wohlgemut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Noble Wohlgemut ( CPSO# 80641 )

Business Address:
230 Canboro Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone Number: (905) 957-3328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANGUS NOBLE WOHLGEMUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE WOHLGEMUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 10 May 2004 to 24 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2005