Noel, Daniel Allen (CPSO#: 81388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Marine and
General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8383
Fax: (519) 524-5579
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 519-272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

98 Shipley St
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: 519-482-3440
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Noel ( CPSO# 81388 )

Business Address:
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ALLEN NOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006