Noelting, Jessica (CPSO#: 110851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2018

Expiry Date:  26 Sep 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Medicine
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
Department of Medicine
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 23 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2017 to 16 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jessica Noelting may practise internal medicine and gastroenterology
                  at Hotel  Dieu  Hospital  and  Kingston  General  Hospital  in  Kingston,
                  Ontario,  while  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College.

            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires  eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Noelting's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Noelting's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining  to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Noelting's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on March 27, 2018, and will expire  on  or
                  before September 26, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.