Nogareda, Jorge Gustavo (CPSO#: 82159)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of La Plata, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2005 to 25 Apr 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005