Nohara, Naomi Jennifer (CPSO#: 80674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Feb 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI JENNIFER NOHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007