Noli, Khalid Abkar Abdallah (CPSO#: 79977)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2006