Noor, Raza Ahmed (CPSO#: 93740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206-3030 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Stroke Clinic
Building B
2202-3000 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-9713
Fax: (416) 431-5259
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raza Noor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Noor ( CPSO# 93740 )

Business Address:
206 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Business Address:
2202 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building B
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-9713

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAZA AHMED NOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015