Noorani, Shamidah (CPSO#: 85136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Craig St
Russell ON  K4R1A1
Phone: 613-445-5333
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noorani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Noorani ( CPSO# 85136 )

Business Address:
Suite 312
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 488-0208

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMIDAH NOORANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008