Noroozi, Nastaran (CPSO#: 87047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 405
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-335-3733
Fax: 416-840-6885
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431 8113
Fax: 416 431 8279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nastaran Noroozi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Noroozi ( CPSO# 87047 )

Business Address:
405 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 335-3733

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8113

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASTARAN NOROOZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOROOZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012