Norrie, Robert Gaye (CPSO#: 79198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Group
205 Queen Street East
Upper Level
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-7418
Fax: (519) 787-7421
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Norrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Norrie ( CPSO# 79198 )

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Group
205 Queen Street East
Upper Level
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Business Address:
801 St David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GAYE NORRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017