Northey, Karen Elizabeth Irene (CPSO#: 77967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
15 Henderson Street
Port Hope ON  L1A 0C6
Phone: (905) 885-8371
Fax: (905) 885-7695
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Northey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Northey ( CPSO# 77967 )

Business Address:
15 Henderson Street
Port Hope ON  L1A 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 885-8371

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH IRENE NORTHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2005