Noseworthy, Stephen Perry (CPSO#: 78768)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CHEO 401 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Instructions: Write or call (613) 737-7600
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2003 to 07 Feb 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 2013