Noticewala, Neelam Natverlal (CPSO#: 83732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ohio State University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Consultation Clinic
Scarborough Hospital- Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2886
Fax: (416) 495-2538
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEELAM NATVERLAL NOTICEWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTICEWALA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007