Nott, Caroline (CPSO#: 91399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus - CPC 214
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4E9
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 18798
Fax: 6137615260
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 31 Jan 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE NOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014