Nour, Rabih (CPSO#: 90382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Apr 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Wayne State University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-2003
Fax: (519) 946-2004
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rabih Nour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nour ( CPSO# 90382 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 567-0381

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 22 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Rabih  Nour  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  endocrinology and
            metabolism, only.