Novac, Anca (CPSO#: 93828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Clinic
250 Harding Blvd W; Suite # 304
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-508-8181
Fax: 905-508-6464
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brookside Court & Hilltop Place
Retirement Home
980 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1M4
Canada
Phone: (905) 884-9248
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Anca Novac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Novac ( CPSO# 93828 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 508-8181

Business Address:
980 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1M4
Phone Number: (905) 884-9248

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANCA NOVAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013