Novak, Marta (CPSO#: 78982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3043
Fax: (416) 340-4198
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 May 2003 to 24 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Marta Novak may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Novak holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Novak no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.