Novakovic, Petar (CPSO#: 91199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6004
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-431-8181
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETAR NOVAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVAKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012