Novena, Angela Rosie (CPSO#: 84289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Dept
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellet
Emergency Dept
1030 Ouellete Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4444
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Novena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Novena ( CPSO# 84289 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA ROSIE NOVENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008