Novin, Ali (CPSO#: 93751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Persian

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Canadian Centre for Integrative
Medicine
12 Main St N
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 31 Oct 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Ali  Novin  may practise physical medicine and rehabilitation at The
                  Canadian Centre for Integrative Medicine in Markham, Ontario, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 31, 2019.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Novin's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does  not  provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Novin's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 31, 2018,  and  will  expire  on or
                  before August 31, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.