Novosedlik, Natalia (CPSO#: 92941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centre for Healthy
Communities
2660 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Phone: 416-847-4111
Fax: 416-261-0782
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131 Ext. 4666
Fax: 416-281-7228
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaun Wai Hong Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Novosedlik ( CPSO# 92941 )
Dr. S. Leong ( CPSO# 93209 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIA NOVOSEDLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVOSEDLIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013