Novoshinov, Sergey (CPSO#: 81197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hosp
Department of Anaesthesia
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2110
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGEY NOVOSHINOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVOSHINOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2012