Nowak-Hariasz, Daria Justyna (CPSO#: 93483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-3520
Fax: (905) 721-6660
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2000 Simco Steet North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-3037
Fax: (905) 721-3199
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIA JUSTYNA NOWAK-HARIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWAK-HARIASZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012