Nowodworski, Dorota Joanna (CPSO#: 89043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nowodworski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nowodworski ( CPSO# 89043 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTA JOANNA NOWODWORSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWODWORSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011