Noyahr, Lori-Anne Alcantara (CPSO#: 95343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori-Anne Noyahr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noyahr ( CPSO# 95343 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI-ANNE ALCANTARA NOYAHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOYAHR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016