Noza, Assefa Fersha (CPSO#: 73450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Ethiopian

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 304
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4
Phone: (647) 775-8281
Fax: (416) 247-0402
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Assefa Noza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Noza ( CPSO# 73450 )

Business Address:
Unit 304
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: NOZA, Assefa Fersha (March 21 2018) Allegations of Dr. Noza’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee. It is alleged that Dr. Noza engaged in the sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in sexual and/or inappropriate contact with Patient A, including sexual and/or inappropriate touching of Patient A’s vagina and rectum.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): March 18-20, 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 30, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Assefa Fersha Noza, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Noza has given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. ASSEFA FERSHA NOZA
                                             ("Dr. Noza")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the
                  College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Noza, certificate of registration number 73450, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, in the matter of College File Number 7215715, allegations that
                  I engaged in professional misconduct. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Noza, have read the Notice of Hearing dated March 21, 2018, which
                  sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective five days from the date this Undertaking is signed ("Effective
                  Date").

            (9)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional
                        encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional Encounter(s)"),
                        with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the
                        Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and
                        under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated
                        health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice
                        Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                        Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I
                        must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during
                        any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian
                        of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations.  I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log by
                        ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to
                        make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Noza, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (11)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                        sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms,
                        in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                        location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states: "Dr.
                        Noza has agreed  not to  have professional encounters, in person or
                        otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                        Dr. Noza must not be alone during any professional encounter with
                        any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                        website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
                  
                  
            (12)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Noza, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I have
                        a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (9)(a), above. 
                  
                  (b)   With respect to patients with whom I have appointments that are
                        scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance, I, Dr. Noza,
                        undertake to ensure that each patient is directly notified, within
                        seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                        of the restriction described in section (9)(a), above.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel
                  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to
                  do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Noza is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee
                        into allegations of professional misconduct.
                  
                        Dr. Noza must not engage in any professional encounters, in person
                        or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless
                        the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a
                        monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the
                        College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Noza's
                        Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity,
                        Dr. Noza must not be alone with any patient during any professional
                        encounter.
                        
                        Dr. Noza shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms
                        and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, that states: "Dr. Noza has agreed not
                        to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with
                        patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a
                        practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Noza must not be alone with any patient
                        during any professional encounter. Further information may be found
                        on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Noza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Noza, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (23)  I, Dr. Noza, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Noza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Noza, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Noza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (27)  I, Dr. Noza, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Assefa Fersha Noza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 30, 2018:

Dr. Noza is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct.

Dr. Noza must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Noza’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Noza must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Noza shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Noza has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Noza must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.