Nuica, Alina Daniela (CPSO#: 89099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 HOSPITAL GATE- #111
Oakville ON  L6M 5A9
Phone: (905) 618-9934
Fax: (289) 271-1132
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nuica Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nuica ( CPSO# 89099 )

Business Address:
Suite 111 and 113
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 618-9934

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALINA DANIELA NUICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010