Nulman, Irena (CPSO#: 68541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Ternopol'skij Medicinskij Institut, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical Pharm. & Tox.
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7887
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 20 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 May 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Irena Nulman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Nulman   holds   a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Nulman no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.