Nunan Barclay, Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 76081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stouffville Medical Centre
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Feb 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JANE NUNAN BARCLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUNAN BARCLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2004