Nuri, Humayun (CPSO#: 92823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: 9059537917
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Humayun Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nuri ( CPSO# 92823 )

Business Address:
Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMAYUN NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 20 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2015