Nwapa, Sylvia Idu (CPSO#: 97165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nigeria, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3211 Sandwich Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1A9
Phone: (519) 946-0208
Fax: (519) 946-0208
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

366 wyandotte street west
Windsor ON  N9A 5X2
Canada
Phone: (519) 962-2691
Fax: (519) 962-2691
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nwapa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nwapa ( CPSO# 97165 )

Business Address:
3211 Sandwich Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1A9
Phone Number: (519) 946-0208

Business Address:
366 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor ON  N9A 5X2
Phone Number: (519) 962-2691

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Sylvia  Idu  Nwapa  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
                  medicine, only.