Nwebube, Nkiruka Ifeyinwa (CPSO#: 87895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 May 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Ibo

Education:University of Nigeria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
P O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2865
Fax: (519) 378-1583
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nkiruka Nwebube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwebube ( CPSO# 87895 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
1800 8th Street East
PO Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 20 May 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Nkiruka Ifeyinwa Nwebube may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics
            and Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine, only.