Nwebube, Nwachukwu Ifeanyi (CPSO#: 83302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Igbo

Education:University of Nigeria, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 309-1947
Fax: (905) 309-3210
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nwachukwu Ifeanyi Nwebube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwebube ( CPSO# 83302 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 309-1947

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NWACHUKWU IFEANYI NWEBUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWEBUBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2007