Nyholt, Noranda (CPSO#: 88366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
239 George Street
Suite B
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P1
Phone: (519)491-2244
Fax: (855)782-3082
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dobbs and Nyholt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dobbs ( CPSO# 91159 )
Dr. N. Nyholt ( CPSO# 88366 )

Business Address:
239 George Street
Suite B
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P1
Phone Number: (519) 491-2244

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORANDA NYHOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NYHOLT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011