Nykamp, Hank (CPSO#: 32610)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 10, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hank Nykamp to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective Ocotber 10, 2017:

Dr. Nykamp has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.