Nykanen, David Gordon (CPSO#: 57344)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2001