Aguilar Rivera, Omar De Jesus (CPSO#: 62965)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Honduras, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Aguilar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Bluewater Health 89 Norman St Sarnia, ON N7T 6S3
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 29 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Aug 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 2018