O'Brien, Colleen Marie (CPSO#: 82247)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2005 to 08 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2006 to 03 Mar 2006
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 2006