O'Carroll, Aoife Marie (CPSO#: 97253)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 26 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 30 May 2016 to 26 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017