O'Connor, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 104039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018