O'Doherty, James Joseph Martin (CPSO#: 56444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Family Health Team
Old Quebec Street Mall
Suite 212
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: 519 837 4444
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
Adult Outpatient Services
850 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G1E8
Canada
Phone: 519 749 4213
Fax: 519 745 1550
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

212-55 Wyndham st. Nth.
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-4444
Fax: (519) 837-2202
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

850 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E8
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4213
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. O'Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Doherty ( CPSO# 56444 )

Business Address:
850 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E8
Phone Number: (519) 748-4213

Business Address:
Suite 212
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-4444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH MARTIN O'DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DOHERTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1986