O'Donnell, David Anthony (CPSO#: 54712)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Service 100 Piccadilly Street London ON N6A 1R8 Tel: 1-888-335-3379 519-672-1460
Instructions: Patients should contact Command Service to request a copy of their medical records
Date Received: 07 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018